+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/22/2021
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Stephens
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 2
- General Order
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McBride, Hasenbeck
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 15, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
March 2, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 5
February 8, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor