+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/22/2021
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
- General Order, Considered
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Energy
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 18
- General Order
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McBride
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 6
February 17, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1