+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/20/2021
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Coauthored by Representative Munson
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 9
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson
- General Order
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Cruz
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Miller
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 6
February 23, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1