+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 15
- General Order
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Kirt (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Elections and Ethics
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Pae
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 6
February 23, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7