+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis
- General Order
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Kirt (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Remove Representative Pae as principal House author and substitute with Representative Stinson
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules
- Withdrawn from Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Pae
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 1, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6