+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
- Title stricken
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
- Coauthored by Senator Pemberton
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Marti
- Coauthored by Representative Davis
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Cornwell
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean), Lawson, McBride
- General Order
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
- Referred for engrossment
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Emergency added
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Baker
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McCall
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
February 21, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 7
February 13, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 26
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor