+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (49)
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/07/2021
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Sent to Governor
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- House Rule suspended
- Fourth Reading and signing rescinded
- SA's adoption rescinded
- Recalled from enrollment
- SA's read, adopted
- Ayes: 74 Nays: 15
- Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 18
- Referred for enrollment
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 19
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Stearman, Stark, Caldwell (Chad), CrosswhiteHader, Williams, Olsen, West (Rick), Gann, Bashore, Kendrix, Smith, Grego, Pfeiffer, Martinez, Roe, Sneed, Marti, Steagall, Russ, Conley
- Ayes: 69 Nays: 19
- SA's read, adopted
- House Rule suspended
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Pederson
- Coauthored by Senator Rogers
- Coauthored by Senator Burns
- Coauthored by Senator Stephens
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 9
- Referred for engrossment
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Merrick
- Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Weaver
- Remove as principal author Representative Conley and substitute with Representative West (Kevin)
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Dahm
- Coauthored by Senator Standridge
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
- Emergency added
- Coauthored by Senator Jett
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remove as author Senator Garvin; authored by Senator Bullard
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Conley
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (8)
May 3, 2021: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 6
May 3, 2021: House Adopt Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 12
May 3, 2021: House Previous Question
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 13
April 29, 2021: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 12
April 29, 2021: House Suspend House Rules
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 18
April 29, 2021: House Adopt Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 13
March 3, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 8
February 23, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor