+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/24/2015
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 8
- General Order, Considered
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Hoskin
- General Order
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Wildlife Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Wildlife
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McCall
- First Reading
+ − Vote
March 2, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 10