+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/23/2021
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 5
- General Order, Considered
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Waldron
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Coauthored by Representative Nollan
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis
- General Order
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Sterling, Moore, Waldron, Mize, Roe
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education and Career Tech
- Withdrawn from Common Education Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Conley
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 2, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 10
February 8, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9