+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/23/2013
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Pittman
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Coauthored by Hulbert
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Remove Senator Jolley as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Ford
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Hoskin
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Nollan
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 16, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4
February 28, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 90
- Absent: 11
February 12, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 16