+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/02/2015
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 16
- Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Loveless
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Kirby
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Motion expired
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Newell
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 39
- Amended
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Osborn, Ritze, Nelson, Cockroft, Billy, Dunlap
- General Order
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Government Oversight and Accountability Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Government Oversight and Accountability
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Newell
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (4)
February 18, 2015: House Shall Decision Of Chair Be Decision Of House
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 27
- Absent: 8
February 18, 2015: House Table
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 27
- Absent: 11
February 18, 2015: House Table
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 65
- Absent: 8
February 18, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 39
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor