+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/29/2013
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 2
- Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 19
- General Order
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Wright
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 23, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 9
February 13, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 8
February 5, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor