+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Vetoed 05/13/2013
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 7; Ayes: 69 Nays: 8
- SA's read, adopted
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- Title restored
- Enacting clause restored
- General Order, Amended
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
- Enacting clause stricken
- Referred to Appropriations
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 9
- Considered
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- General Order
- Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author)
- Laid over
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Title stricken
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Wright
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
May 6, 2013: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 10
May 6, 2013: House Emergency
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 24
March 14, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 12
February 20, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 23
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor