+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 12
- Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Stearman
- General Order
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Emergency added
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Hill
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 9
February 23, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor