+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Enacting clause stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Cox
- First Reading
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- General Order
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 6
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Title stricken
- Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Thomsen
- First Reading
+ − Vote
February 20, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 2