+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/16/2017
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
- SA's read, adopted
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Brumbaugh
- First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1
- General Order
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Yen (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Ritze
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
May 9, 2017: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 90
- Absent: 8
April 25, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 1
March 6, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 8
February 14, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2