+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
- CCR adopted
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- CCR read
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- To Senate
- Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 0
- CCR adopted
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- CCR submitted
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named Treat, Johnson (Rob), Loveless, Brooks, Ellis, Ballenger
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- HC's named: Conference Committee on Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
- Referred for engrossment
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- General Order
- Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 1
- Referred for engrossment
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Published on Consent Docket
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Blackwell
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
May 22, 2013: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Absent: 7
May 16, 2013: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 30
April 9, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 5
March 13, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 14
February 20, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor