+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/16/2013
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
- SA's read, adopted
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
- General Order, Considered
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- General Order
- Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 7
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Published on Consent Docket
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Blackwell
- First Reading
+ − Votes (4)
May 13, 2013: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 6
April 9, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
March 13, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 6
February 6, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor