+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/15/2013
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8
- General Order, Considered
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- General Order
- Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 5
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Published on Consent Docket
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Blackwell
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 9, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 6
March 13, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 5
February 6, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10