+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/02/2017
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
- Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 4
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean)
- General Order
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Wright
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 25, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
March 6, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 8
February 27, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 2
February 16, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7