+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Motion expired
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Wright
- Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 24; Ayes: 61 Nays: 30
- General Order
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Wright
- First Reading
+ − Votes (4)
March 1, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 24
- Absent: 7
March 1, 2017: House Emergency
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 30
- Absent: 8
February 20, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 5
February 15, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor