+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Emergency added
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Stephens
- Remove as author Senator Stephens; authored by Senator Bullard
- Remove as coauthor Senator Bullard
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Olsen
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Burns
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Townley
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Coauthored by Senator Bullard
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 20
- Amended
- House Rule suspended
- Authored by Senator Stephens (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Hardin (David), Fugate, Phillips
- General Order
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Tourism
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Grego
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 4
February 10, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor