+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/20/2021
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
- Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
- Amended by floor substitute
- House Rule suspended
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, Humphrey, Provenzano
- General Order
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips, Mize, Talley
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Stark, Hill
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 10, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 7
February 25, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 4
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor