+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
- Amended
- House Rule suspended
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean)
- General Order
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) ODonnell
- CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative West (Kevin)
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 5
February 11, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor