+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1
- General Order
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass General Government Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative West (Kevin)
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 9
February 17, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7