+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Motion expired
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Ford (principal Senate author)
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Denney
- Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 50 Nays: 42
- Amended
- General Order
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Title stricken
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Denney
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 20, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor