+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 34
- Title stricken
- Amended
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Russ
- General Order
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Burns (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
- Withdrawn from Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Humphrey
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 11, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 34
- Absent: 8
February 25, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor