+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Transportation
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 9
- General Order
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Ellis (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Hickman
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Pruett
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
March 13, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 20
February 25, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 1
February 19, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7