+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- General Order, Amended, considered and deferred
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 17
- General Order
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Hardin (David)
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 12
February 25, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1