+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Grego
- First Reading
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- General Order
- Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, West (Kevin), Bashore, Hill, Russ
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Stephens
- Amended
- Emergency added
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 19
- Referred for engrossment
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean), Sims, Kendrix
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Hardin (David)
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 5
February 10, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor