+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 5
- Authored by Senator Bass (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin
- General Order
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Sherrer
- First Reading
+ − Vote
March 5, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 25