+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/21/2021
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
- Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
- Title stricken
- Referred to Appropriations
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 19
- Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis
- General Order
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Provenzano
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 8
February 16, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor