+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Died in conference
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named Dahm, Sykes, Daniels, Newhouse, Standridge, Pittman, Sparks
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary - Civil and Environmental
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3
- General Order, Considered
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enacting clause stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author)
- General Order
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Brumbaugh, McDugle
- Referred for engrossment
- Amended
- Title stricken
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Echols
- Remove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative Downing
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Echols
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 25, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 4
March 21, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 5
February 8, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1