+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 06/06/2017
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Sent to Governor
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4
- CCR adopted
- Coauthored by Senator Floyd
- Coauthored by Senator Sparks
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- To Senate
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0
- CCR adopted
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- CCR read
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- CCR submitted
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named Holt, Newberry, Leewright, Daniels, Bice, Sparks, Floyd
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary - Civil and Environmental
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- Title restored
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- House Rule suspended
- General Order
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 1
- Amended
- Referred for engrossment
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Holt (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Echols
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (6)
May 25, 2017: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 3
May 24, 2017: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 2
April 26, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 4
March 22, 2017: House Suspend House Rules
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 28
March 22, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 22
February 28, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11