+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 6
- General Order
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Echols
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 6
March 1, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor