+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 32
- General Order
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McCullough
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 32
- Absent: 5
February 26, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor