+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Died in conference
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named Bingman, Marlatt, Quinn, Smalley, Fields, Sparks, Wyrick
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Perryman
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Perryman
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Energy
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Remove Senator Quinn as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Bingman
- General Order
- Coauthored by Representative(s) McBride
- Referred for engrossment
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Quinn, Mazzei
- Amended
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 9
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Committee
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Energy and Natural Resources
- Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Sears
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 20, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 1
March 11, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 5