+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Title stricken
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Dunlap
- First Reading
+ − Vote
March 1, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor