+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
- Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- General Order
- Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 3
- Referred for engrossment
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Title stricken
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Montgomery
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
March 21, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 4
March 1, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 22
February 13, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor