+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/22/2013
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Wood
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author)
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Cleveland
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 16, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Absent: 7
February 13, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 9
February 6, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9