+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Died in conference
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, GCCA
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 18
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enacting clause stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
- Coauthored by Senator Kidd
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 17
- Amended
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Condit, Roberts (Dustin)
- General Order
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Title stricken
- Authored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Sanders
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Cockroft
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (4)
April 25, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 1
March 22, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 13
February 27, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 1
February 8, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8