+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
- General Order, Considered
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 1
- Authored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass General Government Committee
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to General Government Oversight and Accountability
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Newton
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 17, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
February 22, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
February 9, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor