+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/28/2015
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 1
- Emergency added
- Amended
- Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Echols
- General Order
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Grau
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 9, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor