+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Failed in Committee - Appropriations
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Shortey (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute State Government Operations Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to State Government Operations
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Wood
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 11, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor