+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/04/2015
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 4
- SA's read, adopted
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
- General Order, Amended
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Faught
- First Reading
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 14
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze
- General Order
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Wallace
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 28, 2015: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 14
March 2, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 8