+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named Griffin, Fields, Shumate, Standridge, Ivester, Jolley
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- HC's named: Conference Committee on Government Modernization
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author)
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 14
- Amended
- General Order
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Turner
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Government Modernization
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Walker
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 23, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 8
March 6, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 14
February 14, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor