+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Referred for enrollment
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4
- CCR adopted
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- CCR adopted
- Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0
- To Senate
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- CCR read
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- CCR submitted
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named Smalley, McCortney, Coleman, Rosino, Hicks, Young
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Administrative Rules
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 3
- General Order, Considered
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Remove as coauthor Senator Dahm
- Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Withdrawn from Health and Human Services committee
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Failed in Committee - Health and Human Services
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
- Withdrawn from General Government committee
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Dahm
- Remove as author Senator Dahm; authored by Senator Smalley
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Dahm
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Gann
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
May 22, 2019: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 2
May 14, 2019: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 84
- Absent: 17
April 17, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 6
February 26, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor