+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/10/2017
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 12
- SA's read, adopted
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 14
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
- Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Kidd
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 17
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Newton
- General Order
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Title stricken
- Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Ownbey
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Hilbert
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 3, 2017: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 4
April 24, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 3
March 14, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 12
March 1, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 2
February 15, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8