+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 30 Nays: 9
- CCR adopted
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Referred for enrollment
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- CCR read
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- To Senate
- Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 20
- CCR adopted
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Title restored
- CCR submitted
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named Justice, Coates, Schulz, Fields, Garrison, Sparks
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- HC's named: Conference Committee on Agriculture and Wildlife
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Justice
- Senate Rule suspended
- General Order, Considered
- Measure failed: Ayes: 23 Nays: 20
- General Order, Amended
- Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 27 Nays: 12
- Backed up to General Order
- Title stricken
- Measure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 11
- Referred for engrossment
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 64 Nays: 18
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 23
- Referred for engrossment
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author)
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Biggs
- Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 56
- General Order
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Biggs
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
May 23, 2013: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 9
May 16, 2013: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 16
April 23, 2013: Senate Amendment
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 29
- Absent: 6
April 23, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 5
April 23, 2013: Senate Reconsider
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 9
April 23, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 9
February 25, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 23
- Absent: 8
February 20, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 56
- Absent: 5
February 6, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor