+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- CCR ruled nongermae
- Motion to suspend rule failed
- CCR considered
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- CCR submitted
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, GCCA
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- HC's named: Conference Committee on Economic Development and Financial Services
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
- Title stricken
- Coauthored by Brinkley
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Loveless
- First Reading
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin, Sherrer
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 6
- General Order
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Mazzei (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Hall
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
April 24, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 5
March 7, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 8
February 27, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 14